Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2800307 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2800307



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 156
12.04.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
12.05.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.05.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
02.05.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
02.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
11.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.02.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
11.02.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
03.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.01.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
07.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
07.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
07.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 7
17.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 3
21.08.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
13.05.2014 Priority document Search / examination 26
25.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 2
25.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
25.04.2014 Description Search / examination 15
25.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5