Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2800307


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
05.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
14.04.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
06.05.2016 (Expected) grant published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
04.05.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.05.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.05.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.02.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.02.2016 Change - German title published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - English title published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - French title published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
24.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
23.01.2015 Change - designated states published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
23.01.2015 Change - request for examination published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
04.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]