Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2800307
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2800307Global Dossier 08.06.2016B1
EP2800307 05.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
AT502922013 29.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT514215B 15.06.2015B1
AT514215 15.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
AT502922013 29.04.2013