Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808712

EP2808712 - Display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city
Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[2017/28]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city
Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayashi, Yasuhiro
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Div.
1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-city
Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
02 / Kuno, Masahiro
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Div.
1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-city
Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
03 / Kamon, Shinji
c/o HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.
Intellectual Property Div.
1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 107-8556 / JP
 [2017/28]
Former [2014/49]01 / Kobayashi, Yasuhiro
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-city
Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
02 / Kuno, Masahiro
c/o DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-city
Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
03 / Kamon, Shinji
c/o HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 107-8556 / JP
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date14166032.425.04.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateJP2013010318715.05.2013         Original published format: JP 2013103187
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808712
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808712
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/00, F21V8/00
[2017/28]
Former International [2014/49]G02B6/00, F21V8/00, B60Q3/04, G01D11/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtung[2014/49]
English:Display apparatus[2014/49]
French:Appareil d'affichage[2014/49]
Examination procedure27.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
21.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.05.2017Fee for grant paid
02.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/39]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]DE10145036  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [X]JP2001021389  (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,4 * abstract *
by applicantJP2006047271