Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2808712 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2808712



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 160
16.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.07.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
09.06.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
06.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.05.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 2
03.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.04.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
26.04.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
26.04.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.12.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.12.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.12.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
21.12.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
18.11.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.03.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.03.2016 General enquiry Search / examination 1
27.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
08.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
05.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
05.11.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
05.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.10.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
13.05.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
25.04.2014 Description Search / examination 16
25.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 5
25.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5