Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2808712


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
18.05.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
15.06.2017 Change - inventor published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
15.06.2017 Change - inventor
09.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
09.06.2017 Change - classification published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
09.06.2017 Change - classification published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
10.05.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.12.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2015 Change - designated states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
05.04.2015 Change - request for examination published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
02.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
02.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]