Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2762145

EP2762145 - Sodium meta arsenite for use in the treatment of pain and/or inflammation associated with cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.10.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kominox, Inc.
1 Cayman Financial Centre 36A Dr Roy's Drive
George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-1104 / KY
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Sang-Bong
212-1103 Daelim Apt.
Choweon Maul
Pyong-chon-dong
Anyang, Kyonggi-do
431-070 Anyang / KR
02 / Yang, Yong-Jin
25404 Sk Town House
Kumi-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam, Kyonggi-do
463-500 Seongnam / KR
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)EIP
EIP Europe LLP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]EIP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date14166070.409.05.2006
[2014/32]
Priority number, dateEP2005007607109.05.2005         Original published format: EP 05076071
[2019/12]
Former [2014/32]WO2005EP7607109.05.2005
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2762145
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K33/36, A61P35/00, A61P29/00
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/32]
TitleGerman:Natrium Metaarsenit zur Behandlung von Schmerzen und Entzündung in Zusammenhang mit Krebs[2014/32]
English:Sodium meta arsenite for use in the treatment of pain and/or inflammation associated with cancer[2014/32]
French:Sodium meta arsénit pour le traitement de la douleur et de l'inflammation associées au cancer[2014/32]
Examination procedure05.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/12]
05.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2018Date of oral proceedings
27.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.03.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination06.06.2018Appeal received No.  T2214/18
06.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
09.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06732912.8  / EP1885380
EP11165670.8  / EP2361628
Divisional application(s)EP16162414.3  / EP3067068
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]KR20020083458  (KOREA MICRO BIOLOG LAB LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * table 1 *;
 [X]WO9918798  (POLARX BIOPHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 14, line 35 * * page 16, line 35 - page 18, line 17 *;
 [X]WO03086424  (KOREA MICROBIOLOGICAL LAB LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * table 1 *;
 [X]  - MCCABE M J ET AL, "Sensitivity of myelomonocytic leukemia cells to arsenite-induced cell cycle disruption, apoptosis, and enhanced differentiation is dependent on the inter-relationship between arsenic concentration, duration of treatment, and cell cycle phase", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, US, (20001101), vol. 295, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 724 - 733, XP002651235 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 725, column r, paragraph 2 *
 [X]  - MUSCARELLA DONNA E ET AL, "Differential activation of the c-Jun N-terminal kinase pathway in arsenite-induced apoptosis and sensitization of chemically resistant compared to susceptible B-lymphoma cell lines", TOXICOLOGICAL SCIENCES, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, FL, US, (20020701), vol. 68, no. 1, ISSN 1096-6080, pages 82 - 92, XP002651236 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 84, column r, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  - HERSHKO DAN D ET AL, "Arsenite inhibits interleukin-6 production in human intestinal epithelial cells by down-regulating nuclear factor-kappaB activity.", CLINICAL SCIENCE (LONDON, ENGLAND : 1979) OCT 2002, (200210), vol. 103, no. 4, ISSN 0143-5221, pages 381 - 390, XP002726242 [A] 1-4 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/cs1030381
 [A]  - SAKURAI T ET AL, "Evaluation of immunotoxic and immunodisruptive effects of inorganic arsenite on human monocytes/macrophages", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040101), vol. 4, no. 13, doi:10.1016/J.INTIMP.2004.07.027, ISSN 1567-5769, pages 1661 - 1673, XP004580388 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1671, column r, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.intimp.2004.07.027
by applicantWO8000245
 US4256108
 US4166452
 US4265874