Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2762145 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2762145



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 316
19.11.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
05.11.2019 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
24.10.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
29.05.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.05.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
21.05.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.02.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.09.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.08.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
06.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
06.08.2018 Claims Appeal 1
06.08.2018 Claims Appeal 1
06.08.2018 Claims Appeal 1
06.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
06.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
06.08.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
06.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.06.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.06.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.04.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
27.03.2018 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
27.03.2018 Means of redress Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.01.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.01.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
05.01.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
05.01.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
17.07.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
11.07.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
29.06.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.06.2017 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.08.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
01.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.08.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.04.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
05.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
05.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
05.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
11.08.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.07.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 7
09.07.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
09.07.2014 European search report Search / examination 5
09.07.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.06.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Description Search / examination 61
25.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
25.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
02.10.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 67