Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2762145


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.05.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
21.05.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.02.2019 Change - priority published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
07.09.2018 Change: Appeal number
07.08.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
11.06.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
11.06.2018 New entry: Appeal number
01.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
10.07.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.08.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.04.2016 First examination report
25.03.2016 Change - divisional application(s) published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
30.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2015 Change - designated states published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
13.02.2015 Change - request for examination published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
11.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
28.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
04.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]