Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813261

EP2813261 - Active implantable medical device for nerve therapy with stochastic stimulation of the vagus nerve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sorin CRM SAS
Parc d'Affaires NOVEOS
4, Avenue Réaumur
92140 Clamart Cedex / FR
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Legay, Thierry
45, rue Ferdinand Dreyfus
91640 Fontenay Les Briis / FR
02 / Blumstein, Hervé
25 Rue du Marais
28130 Mévoisins / FR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Dupuis-Latour, Dominique
Bardehle Pagenberg
SO Square Opéra
5, rue Boudreau
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Dupuis-Latour, Dominique
Bardehle Pagenberg
10, boulevard Haussmann
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date14166138.928.04.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateFR2013005538411.06.2013         Original published format: FR 1355384
[2014/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813261
Date:17.12.2014
Language:FR
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813261
Date:20.07.2016
Language:FR
[2016/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/36
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Aktive implantierbare medizinische Vorrichtung zur neuronalen Behandlung mit stochastischer Stimulation des Vagusnervs[2014/51]
English:Active implantable medical device for nerve therapy with stochastic stimulation of the vagus nerve[2014/51]
French:Dispositif médical implantable actif de thérapie neuronale avec stimulation stochastique du nerf vague[2014/51]
Examination procedure20.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
24.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2016Fee for grant paid
15.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
15.02.2016Request for further processing filed
15.02.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.03.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201603   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.04.2014
AL20.07.2016
AT20.07.2016
CY20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MK20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU28.04.2014
AL20.07.2016
AT20.07.2016
CY20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2019/31]HU28.04.2014
AL20.07.2016
AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2018/46]AL20.07.2016
AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2018/43]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2018/06]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/10]FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT20.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007027486  (ARMSTRONG RANDOLPH K [US]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0111] - [0114] *;
 [A]US2013066392  (SIMON BRUCE J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011190569  (SIMON BRUCE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011009923  (LEE DONGCHUL [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1897586  (BIOCONTROL MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7076308  (OVERSTREET EDWARD H [US] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2007027486