Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796660

EP2796660 - Mold assemblies including a mold insertable in a container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.09.2017  [2017/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Blvd.
Houston, TX 77072 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Atkins, William Brian
3208 Chenevert Street
Houston, TX Texas 77004 / US
02 / Weaver, Gary Eugene
315 Laura Lane
Conroe, TX Texas 77385 / US
03 / Keller, Christopher
607 Box Elder Drive
Magnolia, TX Texas 77354 / US
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date14166168.628.11.2011
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateGB2010002023429.11.2010         Original published format: GB 201020234
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2796660
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2796660
Date:10.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:E21B10/00, B22C9/22, B22F5/00, B29C33/42
[2016/32]
Former International [2014/44]E21B10/00, B22C9/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
TitleGerman:Gießformanordnungen mit einer in einem Behälter einsetzbaren Form[2014/44]
English:Mold assemblies including a mold insertable in a container[2014/44]
French:Ensembles de moulage comprenant un moule insérable dans un récipient[2014/44]
Examination procedure28.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
11.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/38]
31.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/38]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11799812.0  / EP2646641
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XD]US2007277651  (CALNAN BARRY D [US] ET AL) [XD] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [X]US4243199  (HILL RODMAN K) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US7101168  (WILLEMSEN LOUIS R H A [PH]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 8; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]EP1464220  (WATER GREMLIN CO [US]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015]; claim 1 *;
 [X]JPS6178548  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,4,7,8 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009025984  (BUTEAUD SCOTT [US] ET AL) [A] 3,6 * paragraph [0010]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0014] *