Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2799033 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2799033



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 157
28.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 5
28.04.2014 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
28.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 5
28.04.2014 Description Search / examination 17
28.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
28.04.2014 Annex Search / examination 1
28.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
19.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.10.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
09.10.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
09.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
04.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
04.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
04.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
04.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
21.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
21.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.06.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.06.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
19.06.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.07.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.08.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1