Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2799033


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 (Expected) grant published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
26.06.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.02.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.02.2019 Change - French title published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
15.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
15.05.2015 Change - designated states published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Change - request for examination published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
06.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid