Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799033

EP2799033 - Bone anchors having thread design optimized for fixation in cortical and cancellous bone tissues [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
West, Hugh S. Jr.
5848 South 300 East
Salt Lake City UT 84107 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Adam, Holger , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14166177.722.12.2005
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799033
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2799033
Date:31.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/02, A61B17/04
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Knochenanker mit Gewindegestaltung, die zur Befestigung in kortikalen und sponigiose Knochengeweben optimiert sind[2014/45]
English:Bone anchors having thread design optimized for fixation in cortical and cancellous bone tissues[2014/45]
French:Ancrages d'os dotés d'une conception de filetage optimisée pour une fixation dans des tissus d'os spongieux et corticale[2019/10]
Former [2014/45]Ancrages d'os dotés d'une conception de fil optimisée pour une fixation dans des tissus d'os spongieux et corticale
Examination procedure04.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
21.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2019Fee for grant paid
19.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05855656.4  / EP1962698
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2003065361  (DREYFUSS PETER J [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0030] , [0031] , [0032] - [0036] - [0046] * [Y] 3,7,9,15;
 [Y]EP1584296  (ARTHREX INC [US]) [Y] 3,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] , [0025] , [0026] , [0033] *;
 [Y]EP1588666  (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [Y] 9,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0034] *;
 [A]US4632100  (GOBLE E MARLOWE [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *