Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2775354

EP2775354 - Corona charger including shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU, SK
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2018/40]
Former [2014/37]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Makino, Yuichi
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / Kidaka, Hiroyuki
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2018/40]
Former [2014/37]01 / Makino, Yuichi
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / Kidaka, Hiroyuki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/37]
Application number, filing date14166202.317.12.2009
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateJP2008032440419.12.2008         Original published format: JP 2008324404
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2775354
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2775354
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/02
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/40]
Former [2014/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Korona-Aufladevorrichtung mit Verschluss[2014/37]
English:Corona charger including shutter[2014/37]
French:Chargeur de couronne incluant un obturateur[2014/37]
Examination procedure13.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
13.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2018Fee for grant paid
22.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09179677.1  / EP2199870
Opposition(s)04.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
LU17.12.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/37]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
ES03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/22]CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL03.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[EDL]EP2199870  (CANON KK [JP]) [ED] 1-8 * the whole document * [L] ;
 [A]US2008038011  (NAKAJIMA MASANOBU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
ExaminationJP2001175058
 JPS6199164U
 JPH1020624
by applicantJP2007072212
 EP2199870