Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2939643

EP2939643 - QUALITATIVE METHOD FOR DETERMINING IF A SURFACE HAS WICKING PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.10.2016
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.11.2016  [2016/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2015/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Su, Qi
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Str. 40 - 50
65824 Schwalbach / DE
02 / Liput, Marta
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Str. 40 - 50
65824 Schwalbach / DE
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/45]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date14166216.328.04.2014
[2015/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2939643
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/84
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Qualitatives Verfahren zur Bestimmung, ob eine Oberfläche Dochteigenschaften hat[2015/45]
English:QUALITATIVE METHOD FOR DETERMINING IF A SURFACE HAS WICKING PROPERTIES[2015/45]
French:Procédé qualitatif pour déterminer si une surface possède des propriétés de drainage[2015/45]
Examination procedure05.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/47]
23.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009158825  (KALLMES ANDREW [US]) [X] 1,4-6,9,10,14 * paragraphs [0016] , [0034] - [0041] - [0050]; figure 1 * [I] 2,3,7,8,11-13;
 [XI]EP0422504  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 15, line 51 - page 16, line 20; figure 6 * [I] 2-14;
 [XI]EP0469591  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 3 - line 11; figure 9 * [I] 2-14;
 [A]EP0532002  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 6, line 36 - page 7, line 26; figure 5 *