Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808701

EP2808701 - Apparatus and methods for determining status of a tracking loop [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
O2 Micro, Inc.
3118 Patrick Henry Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Gao, Ke
Level (14) Building (A) Easthope
No. 3 Gaopeng Road
610041 Chengdu / CN
02 / Tang, Deyu
Level (14) Building (A) Easthope
3rd Gaopeng Road
610041 Chengdu / CN
03 / Lu, Shenghong
Level (14) Building (A) Easthope
No. 3 Gaopeng Road
610041 Chengdu / CN
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 30 02 08
51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Lippert, Stachow & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08
51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date14166289.029.04.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateCN2013119881224.05.2013         Original published format: CN201310198812
US20141419767305.03.2014         Original published format: US201414197673
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808701
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01S19/24
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Zustandes einer Nachlaufschleife[2014/49]
English:Apparatus and methods for determining status of a tracking loop[2014/49]
French:Appareil et procédés permettant de déterminer l'état d'une boucle de poursuite[2014/49]
Examination procedure29.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
04.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/52]
10.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/52]
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2007020  (O2MICRO INC [US]) [X] 1,2,9,11-14,20 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0030] * [I] 3-8,10,15-19,21;
 [A]US2003201935  (KING THOMAS M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-21 * figures 2,4 *
 [XI]  - BALAEI A T ET AL, "A Novel Approach in Detection and Characterization of CW Interference of GPS Signal Using Receiver Estimation of C/No", PLANS 2006 - PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE/ION PLANS 2006, THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, 8551 RIXLEW LANE SUITE 360 MANASSAS, VA 20109, USA, (20060427), pages 1120 - 1126, XP056006412 [X] 1-3,9,10,12-14,20 * figure 5 * * pages 1121-1123, sections III ad IV * [I] 11,21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PLANS.2006.1650719
 [XI]  - PARKINSON B W ET AL, Global Positioning System: Theory and Applications, GPS Receivers, GLOBAL POSITIONING SYSTEM: THEORY AND APPLICATIONS; [PROGRESS IN ASTRONAUTICS AND AERONAUTICS VOL. 163], WASHINGTON, DC : AIAA, US, PAGE(S) 329 - 407, (19940101), ISBN 978-1-56347-106-3, XP002294877 [X] 1-3,12-14,20 * pages 390-392, section G.1 * [I] 9-11,21