Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2793516 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2793516



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 295
16.10.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
15.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.10.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.10.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.10.2018 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
11.10.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.10.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
11.10.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
19.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
19.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 6
19.09.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
19.09.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
19.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.09.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
18.07.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.05.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.05.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.05.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.05.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
09.05.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
18.04.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
22.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 11
22.04.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
22.04.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
22.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
22.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
19.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
19.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
24.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
24.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 6
29.04.2014 Description Search / examination 20
29.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 5
14.05.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21