Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2793516


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
18.10.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
14.12.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
09.11.2018 (Expected) grant published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
05.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.10.2018 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
12.10.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.09.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.09.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.09.2018 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.09.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.09.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.05.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.04.2018 Change - classification published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
20.04.2018 Change - classification published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
06.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
01.05.2015 Change - designated states published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
01.05.2015 Change - request for examination published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
06.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
19.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
03.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid