Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793516

EP2793516 - Encoding method and apparatus for frame synchronization signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
B1-3A Intellectual Property Department
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2018/50]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Intellectual Property Department
B1-3A, Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Berggren, Fredrik
Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd.,
Intellectual Property Department
B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN
02 / Popovic, Branislav
Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd.,
Intellectual Property Department
B1-3A, Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Kreuz, Georg Maria
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH
Riesstraße 25
80992 München / DE
[2018/50]
Former [2014/43]Kreuz, Georg Maria
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH
Messerschmittstrasse 4
80992 München / DE
Application number, filing date14166303.910.10.2008
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateCN20071016312810.10.2007         Original published format: CN200710163128
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793516
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793516
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W56/00, H04J11/00, H04J13/12, H04J13/18
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/23]
Former [2014/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Codierungsverfahren und -vorrichtung für Rahmensynchronisationssignal[2014/43]
English:Encoding method and apparatus for frame synchronization signal[2014/43]
French:Procédé de codage et appareil pour signal de synchronisation de trame[2014/43]
Examination procedure22.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
09.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.09.2018Fee for grant paid
19.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.10.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
11.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08840700.2  / EP2111078
EP11192582.2  / EP2472967
Divisional application(s)EP18211457.9  / EP3525525
Opposition(s)13.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
DK12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
SI12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]AT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
DK12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
Former [2019/46]AT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
Former [2019/39]CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
Former [2019/37]CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/35]CZ12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]  - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "Secondary SCH Mapping and Scrambling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-074143 TI SSCH DESIGN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071002), vol. RAN WG1, no. Shanghai, China; 20071002, XP050107675 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HUAWEI, "S-SCH sequences based on concatenated Golay-Hadamard codes", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-072897, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070620), vol. RAN WG1, no. Orlando, USA; 20070620, XP050106575 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *