Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2769734

EP2769734 - A vaccine directed against porcine pleuropneumonia and a method to obtain such a vaccine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.10.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intervet International B.V.
Wim de Körverstraat 35
5831 AN Boxmeer / NL
[2014/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Klaasen, Henricus Leo Bernardus Maria
Wim de Körverstraat 35
5831 AN Boxmeer / NL
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Intervet International B.V.
Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Janssen, Paulus J. P.
Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd.
European Patents
Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire
EN11 9BU / GB
Application number, filing date14166316.105.08.2010
[2014/35]
Priority number, dateEP2009016734206.08.2009         Original published format: EP 09167342
US20090231820P06.08.2009         Original published format: US 231820 P
[2014/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2769734
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/05, A61K39/39, A61K35/74, A61K39/00
[2014/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
TitleGerman:Impfstoff gegen Schweine-Pleuropneumonie und Verfahren zur Impfstoffherstellung[2014/35]
English:A vaccine directed against porcine pleuropneumonia and a method to obtain such a vaccine[2014/35]
French:Vaccin contre la pleuropneumonie porcine et procédé pour obtenir ledit vaccin[2014/35]
Examination procedure13.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/15]
21.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2017
20.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination13.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1514/17
12.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10739632.7  / EP2461823
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2006108586  (SANOFI PASTEUR [FR]; BIOSYNTH [IT]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9314115  (PORRO MASSIMO [IT]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0453024  (AKZO NV [NL] AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - JIRAWATTANAPONG ET AL, "Efficacy of a subunit vaccine against Actinobacillus pleuropneumoniae", JOURNAL OF SWINE HEALTH AND PRODUCTION, (20080701), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 193 - 199, XP007913291 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - DUBREUIL J DANIEL ET AL, "Actinobacillus pleuropneumoniae surface polysaccharides: Their role in diagnosis and immunogenicity", ANIMAL HEALTH RESEARCH REVIEWS, CABI PUBLISHING, GB, (20001201), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1466-2523, pages 73 - 93, XP009134255 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - RAMJEET MAHENDRASINGH ET AL, "Mutation in the LPS outer core biosynthesis gene, galU, affects LPS interaction with the RTX toxins ApxI and ApxII and cytolytic activity of Actinobacillus pleuropneumoniae serotype 1", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20081001), vol. 70, no. 1, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 221 - 235, XP009134242 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - RIOUX STEPHANE ET AL, "Evaluation of the protective efficacy of Actinobacillus pleuropneumoniae serotype 1 detoxified lipopolysaccharides or O-polysaccharide-protein conjugate in pigs", RESEARCH IN VETERINARY SCIENCE, BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION, LONDON, GB, (19980901), vol. 65, no. 2, ISSN 0034-5288, pages 165 - 167, XP009134285 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - COOPERSTOCK M ET AL, "POLYMYXIN B INACTIVATION OF LIPO POLY SACCHARIDE IN VACCINES OF GRAM NEGATIVE BACTERIA", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US, (19810701), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 315 - 318, XP009133051 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - FROM A H L ET AL, "POLYMYXIN B SULFATE MODIFICATION OF BACTERIAL ENDO TOXIN EFFECTS ON THE DEVELOPMENT OF ENDO TOXIN SHOCK IN DOGS", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US, (19790301), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 660 - 664, XP009134313 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - BANNATYNE R M ET AL, "REDUCING THE ENDO TOXIC ACTIVITY OF PERTUSSIS VACCINE", JOURNAL OF HYGIENE, (1981), vol. 87, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1724, pages 377 - 382, XP002585580 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - CARDOSO LUCIANA S ET AL, "Polymyxin B as inhibitor of LPS contamination of Schistosoma mansoni recombinant proteins in human cytokine analysis", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1186/1475-2859-6-1, (20070103), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 1475-2859, page 1, XP021024076 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2859-6-1
 [A]  - BHOR ET AL, "Polymyxin B: An ode to an old antidote for endotoxic shock", MOLECULAR BIOSYSTEMS, (20050729), vol. 1, doi:10.1039/b500756a, pages 213 - 222, XP007913281 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - FREY J, "VIRULENCE IN ACTINOBACILLUS PLEUROPNEUMONIAE AND RTX TOXINS", TRENDS IN MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., KIDLINGTON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0966-842X(00)88939-8, (19950701), vol. 3, no. 7, ISSN 0966-842X, pages 257 - 261, XP002039389 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0966-842X(00)88939-8
 [AP]  - MERCK, "Pneu Pac; Merck Animal Health; Actinobacillus pleuropneumoniae Bacterin", COMPENDIUM OF VETERINARY PRODUCTS, MERCK, (20130201), page 1, XP007921521 [AP] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "ZUSAMMENFASSUNG DER MERKMALE DES TIERARZNEIMITTELS (Porcilis APP)", (19951229), pages 1 - 3, 19951229, URL: http://portal.dimdi.de/amispb/doc/pei/Web/2603410-spcde-20090901.pdf, (20130201), XP007921519 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - RIDREMONT B ET AL, "LABORATORY STUDY OF APP VACCINATION WITH A SUBUNIT VACCINE ON ANTIBODY SEROLOGICAL RESPONSE IN SPF PIGLETS", vol. 2, (20060101), page 235, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 19TH IPVS CONGRESS,, URL: http://www.ivis.org/proceedings/ipvs/2006/BACTERIAL/P_16-01.pdf?LA=1, (20130201), XP007921520 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - IBSEN P ET AL, "Lipopolysaccharides in a traditional pertussis vaccine", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL STANDARDIZATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0092-1157(88)90018-2, ISSN 0092-1157, (19880101), pages 299 - 302,IN5, (19880101), XP023085764 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-1157(88)90018-2
 [Y]  - LARTER W E ET AL, "IN-VIVO EFFECT OF POLYMYXIN B ON PERTUSSIS VACCINE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF DISEASES OF CHILDREN, AMERICAN MEDICAL SOCIETY, US, (19840301), vol. 138, no. 3, ISSN 0002-922X, pages 281 - 283, XP009134243 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Marion Krug ET AL, "Fondation Recherches 3R / 3R Info Bulletins / Prevention of adverse effects in pigs after vaccination", 3R-INFO-BULLETIN 18, (20010901), pages 1/4 - 4/4, URL: http://www.forschung3r.ch/fr/publications/bu18_print.html, (20140206), XP055100785 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [T]  - "EP10739632 STIN 1", EP10739632 STIN 1, (20131218), XP055100787
 [A]  - LARRY BARAFF ET AL, "ANALYSES OF ADVERSE REACTIONS TO DIPHTHERIA AND TETANUS TOXOIDS AND PERTUSSIS VACCINE BY VACCINE LOT ENDOTOXIN CONTENT PERTUSSIS VACCINE POTENCY AND PERCENTAGE OF MOUSE WEIGHT GAIN", PEDIATRIC INFECTIOUS DISEASE JOURNAL, (19890101), vol. 8, no. 8, ISSN 0891-3668, pages 502 - 507, XP055100786 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006454-198908000-00006
 [T]  - "EP10739632 STIN 2", EP10739632 STIN 2, (20140113), XP055100788
 [T]  - "EP10739632 STIN 3", EP10739632 STIN 3, (20140113), XP055100789
 [A]  - DAVID A GEIER ET AL, "Clinical implications of endotoxin concentrations in vaccines", ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHERAPY, (20020501), vol. 36, no. 5, ISSN 1060-0280, pages 776 - 780, XP055100790 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1345/aph.1A410
 [A]  - D A BROWN ET AL, "EFFECT OF POLYMYXIN B ON THE ANTIGENICITY OF OUTER MEMBRANE FROM SERRATIA-MARCESCENS", MICROBIOS LETTERS, (19760101), vol. 2, no. 7-8, ISSN 0307-5494, pages 189 - 196, XP055100791 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DOUGLAS A.WEBER AND JOSEPH C.TSANG, "IMMUNOCHEMICAL BEHAVIOR OF LIPO POLY SACCHARIDES FROM SERRATIA-MARCESCENS AFTER POLYMYXIN B TREATMENT", MICROBOS LETTERS, (19760101), pages 125 - 130, XP055100793 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0453024
    - JULIEN GOURE ET AL., BMC GENOMICS 2009, (20090224), vol. 10, page 88
    - DUBREUIL ET AL., ANIMAL HEALTH RESEARCH REVIEWS, (200012), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 73 - 93
    - FENWICK ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH, (198609), vol. 47, no. 9
    - RAPP ET AL., CANADIAN VETERINARY JOURNAL, (1988), vol. 29, no. 7, pages 585 - 587
    - RIOUX ET AL., COMPARATIVE IMMUNOLOGY, MICROBIOLOGY & INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (199701), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 63 - 74
    - RESEARCH IN VETERINARY SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 65, pages 165 - 167
    - COOPERSTOCK ET AL., JOURNAL ''INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (198107), pages 315 - 318
    - BANNATYNE ET AL., JOURNAL OF HYGIENE (CAMBRIDGE, (1981), vol. 87, pages 377 - 381
    - LARTER ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF DISEASES OF CHILDREN, (198403), vol. 138
    - RAMJEET ET AL., MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 70, no. 1, pages 221 - 235