Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2824315

EP2824315 - Method of controlling engine of start-stop vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 30.08.2017  [2017/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSIS Co., Ltd.
1026-6, Hogye-Dong Dongan-gu, Anyang-si
Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Jang, Jae Hoon
c/o LSIS CO., LTD.
1026-6 Hogye-dong, Dongan-gu
431-080 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2015/03]
Application number, filing date14166318.729.04.2014
[2015/03]
Priority number, dateKR2013008058109.07.2013         Original published format: KR 20130080581
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2824315
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:F02N11/08, G08G1/0967
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Motors eines Start-Stopp-Fahrzeugs[2015/03]
English:Method of controlling engine of start-stop vehicle[2015/03]
French:Procédé de commande de moteur de véhicule avec un système de démarrage-arrêt[2015/03]
Examination procedure06.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/12]
25.07.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]JP2000145492  (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,11 * abstract * [Y] 3,9 [I] 6,12;
 [X]DE4038013  (HASSLER FRANZ [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-12 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 22 *;
 [Y]US2002157883  (OGATA MAKOTO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 3,9 * paragraphs [0096] - [0099] *;
 [A]US6112152  (TUTTLE JOHN R [US]) [A] 6,12 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 17 *;
 [A]US2010125402  (BANSAL RAVI P [US] ET AL) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0016] *