Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2824315


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.07.2017 Withdrawal of application published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
03.06.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.02.2015 Change - designated states published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
13.02.2015 Change - request for examination published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
14.01.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.01.2015  [2015/03]
12.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  14.01.2015  [2015/03]