Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829623

EP2829623 - Improved aluminum-copper-lithium alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arconic Inc.
201 Isabella Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15212 / US
[2017/15]
Former [2017/11]For all designated states
Arconic Inc.
201 Isabella Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Alcoa Inc.
201 Isabella Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Colvin, Edward L.
1423 Simmonsville Road
Newport, Virginia 24128 / US
02 / Rioja, Roberto J.
4885 Bulltown Road
Murrysville Pennsylvania 15668 / US
03 / Yocum, Les A.
3464 Hamilton Street
West Lafayette Indiana 47906 / US
04 / Denzer, Diana K.
124 Clarendon Avenue
Lower Burrell Pennsylvania 15068 / US
05 / Cogswell, Todd K.
1207 Stoneripple Circle
Lafayette Indiana 47909 / US
06 / Bray, Gary H.
3816 Buckingham Court
Murrysville Pennsylvania 15668 / US
07 / Sawtell, Ralph R.
466 Four Lakes Drive
Gibsonia Pennsylvania 15044 / US
08 / Wilson, Andre L.
120 Apple Hill Drive
Delmont, PA 15626 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Lenzing Gerber Stute
PartG von Patentanwälten m.b.B.
Bahnstraße 9
40212 Düsseldorf / DE
[2018/06]
Former [2015/05]Lenzing Gerber Stute
Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten
Bahnstraße 9
40212 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date14166345.004.12.2008
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateUS20070992330P04.12.2007         Original published format: US 992330 P
[2015/05]
Previously filed application, dateWO2008US8554704.12.2008
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829623
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2829623
Date:07.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:C22C21/18, C22C21/16, C22F1/057
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/36]
Former [2015/05]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verbesserte Aluminium-Kupfer-Lithium-Legierungen[2015/05]
English:Improved aluminum-copper-lithium alloys[2015/05]
French:Alliages d ́aluminium-cuivre-lithium améliorés[2015/05]
Examination procedure28.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/36]
25.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.01.2017Fee for grant paid
31.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
07.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08857160.9  / EP2231888
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.10.2018  31.10.2018  ADMISSIBLE
C-Tec Constellium Technology Center
CS10027 Propriété Industrielle
725 Rue Aristide Berges
38341 Voreppe / FR
Opponent's representative
Constellium - Propriété Industrielle
C-TEC Constellium Technology Center
Propriété Industrielle
Parc Economique Centr'Alp
725, rue Aristide Bergès, CS10027
38341 Voreppe / FR
 [2018/49]
21.11.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.04.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
07.11.2017Request for further processing filed
07.11.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.12.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
31.01.2017Request for further processing filed
31.01.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.02.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
MC07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SI07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
LU04.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/39]AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SI07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
LU04.12.2018
Former [2019/13]AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SI07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/51]AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
DK07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
CZ07.02.2018
EE07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
SK07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/40]AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
BG07.05.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/39]AT07.02.2018
CY07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
LV07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
SE07.02.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
IS07.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
NO07.05.2018
GR08.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY07.02.2018
ES07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
PL07.02.2018
NO07.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.02.2018
FI07.02.2018
HR07.02.2018
LT07.02.2018
NL07.02.2018
NO07.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9504837  (MARTIN MARIETTA CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH03107440  (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3; table 1 *;
 [A]US5076859  (RIOJA ROBERTO J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
OppositionWO9504837
 US2005006008
 US5211910
 US5462712
    - CHUNG D.S. et al., "Effect of Mn Addition on the Mechanical Properties in Al-Cu-Li-Mg-Ag-Zr Alloys", Materials Science Forum, (20070315), vol. 539-543, pages 481 - 486, XP055528617
    - MATTHEW J. CRILL et al., "Evaluation of AA 2050-T87 Al-Li Alloy Crack Turning Behavior", Materials Science Forum, (20060000), vol. 519-521, pages 1323 - 1328, XP055528620
    - James C. Williams, Edgar A. Starke, "Progress in structural materials for aerospace systems", Acta Materialia, (20030000), vol. 51, pages 5775 - 5799, XP055528624
    - Anonymous, "International Alloy Designations and Chemical Composition Limits for Wrought Aluminum and Wrought Aluminum Alloys", The Aluminum Association, Inc, (20021000), page 1pp, 3, 10, XP055528629
    - PICKENS, J. R. et al., "The Effect of Zn on Nucleation in Al- Cu-Li-Ag-Mg Alloy, WeldaliteTM 049 (X2094)", PICKENS, J. R. et al., M. Peters and P.-J. Winkler, Aluminum Lithium, DGM Informationsfesellschaft mbH, (19920000), vol. 1, pages 3pp, 357 - 362, ISBN 3-88355-180-5, XP055528640
    - JOHN E. HATCH, "Effects of alloying elements and impurities on properties", JOHN E. HATCH, JOHN E. HATCH, Aluminum Properties and Physical Metallurgy, American Society for Metals, (19840000), pages 238 - 239, ISBN 0-87170-176-6, XP055528658
    - Starke E A; Staley J T, "Application of Modern Aluminum Alloys to Aircraft", PROGRESS IN AEROSPACE SCIENCES, (19950000), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 131 - 172, XP029212053

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0376-0421(95)00004-6