Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801433

EP2801433 - Method for manufacturing cutting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.05.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.06.2016  [2016/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kanefusa Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Nakaoguchi, Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken 480-0192 / JP
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Nishio, Satoru
c/o KANEFUSA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Nakaoguchi
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken, 480-0192 / JP
02 / Yamada, Nobuhide
c/o KANEFUSA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Nakaoguchi
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken, 480-0192 / JP
03 / Nakano, Takao
c/o KANEFUSA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Nakaoguchi
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken 480-0192 / JP
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date14166372.429.04.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateJP2013010010110.05.2013         Original published format: JP 2013100101
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2801433
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2801433
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:B23K31/02, B23K26/32, B23K1/005, B23K26/00
[2015/26]
Former International [2014/46]B23K31/02, B23K26/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Schneidwerkzeugen[2014/46]
English:Method for manufacturing cutting tool[2014/46]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un outil de coupe[2014/46]
Examination procedure29.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
05.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/24]
01.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/24]
Documents cited:Search[YD]JPH11207688  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [YD] 1-3 * paragraphs [0032] , [0068] , [0102]; figures 1-40; claims 1-41 *;
 [Y]US6612204  (DROESE JOACHIM [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-3 * figures 1-10; claims 1-19 *;
 [Y]DE102012015766  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; claims 1-10 *;
 [Y]EP2455178  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0046] - [0048]; claims 1-3 *
by applicantJP3584716B