Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2801433 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2801433



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 57
11.05.2016 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
01.02.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
22.09.2015 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.05.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
21.05.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
07.05.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.07.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
30.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 12
13.05.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Description Search / examination 11
29.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 4
29.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5