blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2800308 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2800308



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 241
11.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.06.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
11.06.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
11.06.2019 Claims Search / examination 5
11.06.2019 Description Search / examination 2
11.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.06.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.04.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
03.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.04.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
05.12.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
19.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
19.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.12.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 24
15.12.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
15.12.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.12.2017 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.11.2017 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
17.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
04.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
04.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.08.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
06.08.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
28.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.07.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
30.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 51
29.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
29.04.2014 Description Search / examination 32
29.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 9
29.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5