blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2800308


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.06.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.12.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.04.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.12.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.12.2017 First examination report
02.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2015 Change - representative
12.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
08.05.2015 Change - designated states published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
08.05.2015 Change - request for examination published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
04.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]