blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2800308
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019124005Global Dossier 25.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201313874008 30.04.2013
US201815985394 21.05.2018
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10021027Global Dossier 10.07.2018B2
US2014321277 30.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313874008 30.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2800308Global Dossier 05.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313874008 30.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2850874 30.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313874008 30.04.2013