Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800308

EP2800308 - Tunnel failover [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
1701 JFK Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Lynn, Thomas William Jr.
417 Hancock Ct.
Berryville, VA 22611 / US
02 / Sanderson, Philip Andrew
4605 Grenwich Lane
Mount Laurel, NJ 08054 / US
03 / Hilgenfeld, Brad A.
113 Evette Place
Winchester, PA 22602 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14166418.529.04.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateUS20131387400830.04.2013         Original published format: US201313874008
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800308
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04L12/26
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Tunnelsausfallsicherung[2014/45]
English:Tunnel failover[2014/45]
French:Basculement de tunnel[2014/45]
Examination procedure04.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
15.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2008043374  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 32 - page 7, line 26 * * figures 1-3 * * claims 1-11 * [I] 3,4,7,10,15;
 [XI]GB2485024  (AVAYA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,7,10,15;
 [A]EP1075118  (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0052] * * claims 1-14 *
 [XI]  - "Dynamic Load-Balancing And Failover For Wireless Base Station", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20110718), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013147536 [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,7,10,15