Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814158

EP2814158 - Power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Joon Hwan
305-1602, Raemian Ever heim Apt.
Naeson-dong
Uiwang-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Lee, Min Kwang
106-904, Manhyeonmaeul-Lotte Castle Apt.
Sanghyeon-2 dong
Suji-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Yang, Soon Bae
209-1305, Hyojachon Donga Apt.
Seohyeon-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Kim, Jae Jin
201, 2-3, Cheongpa-dong 2-ga
Yongsan-gu
Seoul / KR
05 / Lee, Dong Gyu
823-1204, Byeokjeokgol 8 Danji Apt.
Yeongtong-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
06 / Chu, Jung Suk
109-1405, Doosan Weve Apt.
Banwol-dong
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14166459.929.04.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateKR2013004997803.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130049978
KR2014000046102.01.2014         Original published format: KR 20140000461
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2814158
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2814158
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/07, H02M1/42, H02M7/217
[2015/37]
Former International [2014/51]H02M3/07
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/16]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Leistungszufuhr[2014/51]
English:Power supply[2014/51]
French:Alimentation[2014/51]
Examination procedure09.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/16]
27.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2010014330  (CHANG SHUN-TE [TW], et al) [X] 1-8,11-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1,3 * [A] 9,10;
 [X]DE102011100010  (TRIDONIC GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [X] 1,2,11-13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]  - CLÁUDIO MANOEL C DUARTE C M C ET AL, "An Improved Family of ZVS-PWM Active-Clamping DC-to-DC Converters", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER ELECTRONICS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, USA, (20020101), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 0885-8993, XP011043618 [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3 *