Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799355

EP2799355 - Plastic container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BITO-Lagertechnik Bittmann GmbH
Obertor 29
55590 Meisenheim / DE
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Pick, Rolf
Flurstraße 9
55767 Hattgenstein / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Wilhelmstraße 7
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14166627.130.04.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateDE20131020794330.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013207943
[2014/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2799355
Date:05.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2799355
Date:25.02.2015
Language:DE
[2015/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2799355
Date:22.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:B65D1/22
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kunststoffbehälter[2014/45]
English:Plastic container[2014/45]
French:Récipient en plastique[2014/45]
Examination procedure08.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
21.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2017Fee for grant paid
11.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
IE30.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/08]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
LU30.04.2018
Former [2018/52]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/43]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/40]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/37]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/35]CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/24]FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19844014  (LINPAC STUCKI KUNSTSTOFFVERARB [DE]) [X] 1-8,11,12 * column 3, line 30 - line 67; figure - * [A] 9,10,13-20;
 [X]WO2011120641  (UTZ GEORG HOLDING AG [CH]; RITZBERGER AXEL [CH]) [X] 1-8,11,12 * page 5, paragraph 4; figure 2 *;
 [X]DE20315302U  (SCHAEFER GMBH FRITZ [DE]) [X] 1-8,11 * paragraph [0018]; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0989063  (LINPAC STUCKI KUNSTSTOFFVERARB [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4411647  (STUCKI KUNSTSTOFFWERK [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
by applicantDE4006188