Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799802

EP2799802 - Heat exchanger for installation in confined spaces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAUTAU GmbH
Wilhelm-Hautau Strasse 2
31691 Helpsen / DE
[2017/23]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
HAUTAU GmbH
Bahnhofstrasse 56-60
31691 Helpsen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Faatz, Stefan
Flachsbleiche 16a
32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14166628.930.04.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateDE20131010458303.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013104583
[2014/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799802
Date:05.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:F28D9/00, F28F21/06
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wärmeübertrager zum Einbau in beengte Platzverhältnisse[2014/45]
English:Heat exchanger for installation in confined spaces[2014/45]
French:Échangeur thermique destiné à être intégré dans des espaces réduits[2014/45]
Examination procedure06.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/09]
04.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/30]
19.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3033413  (MCNAB JOHN LESLIE GRAHAM; HEATH MALCOLM REX WALTER) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figure 2 * [Y] 6-8;
 [X]DE102011113045  (KARLSRUHER INST TECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 2 *;
 [X]DE102007045123  (BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure 3 *;
 [Y]DE202008010685U  (KLINGENBURG GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6,8 * figures 4-5 *;
 [Y]US2006196649  (SHIBATA HIROSHI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 7 * figure 2 *;
 [YD]DE19853526  (PAUL EBERHARD [DE]) [YD] 6 * figures 5-6 *
by applicantDE19853526