Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799747

EP2799747 - Brake actuator and method for making a spring brake actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC
901 Cleveland Street
Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Plantan, Ronald S.
193 Plantation Drive
Morresville, NC North Carolina 28117 / US
02 / Clair, Eugene E.
221 Side Saddle Lane
Berea, OH Ohio 44017 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14166696.630.04.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateUS20131387597902.05.2013         Original published format: US201313875979
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799747
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16K31/126, F16J3/02, F15B15/10
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bremsaktuator und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Federbremsaktuators[2014/45]
English:Brake actuator and method for making a spring brake actuator[2014/45]
French:Actionneur de frein et procédé de fabrication d'un actionneur de frein à ressort[2014/45]
Examination procedure05.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
14.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5433138  (CHOINSKI GRAYDON J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,13 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 68; figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4,6,11,12,14;
 [XI]WO0181728  (INDIAN HEAD INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,13 * page 4, line 16 - page 8, line 22; figures 1,2 * [I] 3,4,6,11,12,14;
 [XI]GB1521657  (LEAR SNC) [X] 1,5,7,9,13 * page 1, lines 10,14 * * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 41; figures 1-3 * [I] 2-4,6,8,10-12,14;
 [XI]GB445867  (GRESHAM & CRAVEN LTD, et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,11-13 * page 2, lines 87-102 * * page 3, lines 52-85; figure 1 * [I] 2,6,8,10,14;
 [XI]DE102007048360  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7,11-13 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024]; figure 3 * [I] 2,6,8-10,14;
 [A]US2687908  (STEPHEN VORECH) [A] 1-14 * column 4, lines 41-48; figures 1,9 *