Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2799747 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2799747



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 165
15.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
15.03.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
15.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 7
15.03.2018 Description Search / examination 2
15.03.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
14.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
14.03.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
14.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 7
14.03.2018 Description Search / examination 2
14.03.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
14.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
14.11.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.10.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.07.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
05.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
05.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
05.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
05.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
05.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
05.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.11.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
10.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.08.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
06.08.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
29.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
30.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
30.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 6
30.04.2014 Description Search / examination 9
30.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 2
30.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5