Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2799747


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.11.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.11.2017 First examination report
25.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.05.2015 Change - designated states published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Change - request for examination published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
07.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
04.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]