Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2824522

EP2824522 - Human safety provision in mobile automation environments [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2017/47]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
ABB Technology AG
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Ciarelli, Gary
3097 Exeter Drive
Milford, MI Michigan 48380 / US
02 / Nidamarthi, Srinivas
201 N. Squirrel Road Apt. 703
Auburn Hills, MI Michigan 48326 / US
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2017/48]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Former [2015/03]Postiglione, Ferruccio , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date14166715.430.04.2014
[2015/03]
Priority number, dateUS201361819921P06.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361819921 P
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2824522
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2824522
Date:29.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16P3/14, B25J9/16
[2017/33]
Former International [2015/03]G05B9/02, G05B19/042, G05B19/418, B25J9/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2015/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Menschliche Sicherheitsvorkehrung in mobilen Automatisierungsumgebungen[2015/03]
English:Human safety provision in mobile automation environments[2015/03]
French:Fourniture de sécurité humaine dans des environnements d'automatisation mobile[2015/03]
Examination procedure14.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/34]
24.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2017Fee for grant paid
17.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.08.2018  21.08.2018  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 [2018/39]
12.09.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.01.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
FR30.04.2018
GB30.04.2018
IE30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/19]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
GB30.04.2018
IE30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
Former [2019/12]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
GB30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
LU30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
LU30.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
IT29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT29.11.2017
CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/34]AT29.11.2017
DK29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
NL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/23]AT29.11.2017
ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SE29.11.2017
NO28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES29.11.2017
FI29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
NO28.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012290132  (KOKUBO WATARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 53] - paragraphs [0057] , [0 70]; figures 3-5 *;
 [XA]US6393362  (BURNS RAY L [US]) [X] 1,8,14 * column 5; figure 9 * [A] 2-7,9-13,15,16;
 [XA]WO2010065864  (CROWN EQUIP CORP [US]) [X] 1,8,14 * figures 4, 5 * [A] 2-7,9-13,15,16;
 [A]US2009043440  (MATSUKAWA YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010191372  (NIHEI RYO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 13, 14 *;
 [A]US2005222713  (KAWABE KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 8-10 *
ExaminationUS2002186299