Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2762108

EP2762108 - Computer controlled prosthetic knee device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freedom Innovations, LLC
3 Morgan
Irvine, California 92618 / US
[2018/34]
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
Freedom Innovations, LLC
3 Morgan
Irvine, California 92618 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Palmer, Michael
6 Edgartown Street
Ladera Ranch, California 92694 / US
02 / Bisbee, Charles R. III
25466 Pacific Hills Drive
Mission Viejo, California 92692 / US
 [2018/34]
Former [2014/32]01 / Palmer, Michael
6 Edgartown Street
Ladera Ranch, CA California 92694 / US
02 / Bisbee, Charles R. III
25466 Pacific Hills Drive
Mission Viejo, CA California 92692 / US
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[2018/34]
Former [2014/32]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date14166804.628.07.2006
[2014/32]
Priority number, dateUS20050703588P29.07.2005         Original published format: US 703588 P
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2762108
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2762108
Date:22.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/64, A61F2/30, A61F2/38, A61F2/68, A61F2/70, A61F2/50, A61F2/74, A61F2/76
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/34]
Former [2014/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Neuartige computergesteuerte Knieprothese[2014/32]
English:Computer controlled prosthetic knee device[2014/32]
French:Nouveau dispositif prothétique de genou commandé par ordinateur[2018/12]
Former [2014/32]Nouveau dispositif prothétique de genou commande par ordinateur
Examination procedure07.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/09]
27.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2018Fee for grant paid
26.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06788878.4  / EP1909708
Opposition(s)23.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.10.2017Request for further processing filed
06.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.10.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
01.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
01.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
01.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
01.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
01.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
05.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201510   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SI22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/22]CZ22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/21]FI22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/13]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT22.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0027318  (MAUCH INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 5, line 16 - page 27, line 36 *;
 [XP]EP1570817  (NABCO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-9 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0043] *;
 [X]GB2367753  (BLATCHFORD & SONS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005037151  (OESSUR HF [IS]; GRAMNAES FINN [SE]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 34 - page 7, line 35 *
by applicantUS6764520
 US6755870
 US6740125
 US6719806
 US6673117
 US6610101
 US6517585
 US6423098
 US6113642
 US5888212
 US5571205
 US5383939
 US5190126
 US6978872