blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2824709

EP2824709 - Organic light-emitting display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.09.2017  [2017/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
17113, 1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2015/40]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
95, Samsung 2 Ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-City
Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Yun, Young Nam
305-2102, 111
Yeongtong-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Kyu Seok
403-605, 10
Geumhwa-ro 58beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2015/03]
Application number, filing date14166953.105.05.2014
[2015/03]
Priority number, dateKR2013008104310.07.2013         Original published format: KR 20130081043
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2824709
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2824709
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2015
ClassificationIPC:H01L27/32
[2015/03]
CPC:
H10K59/38 (EP,KR,US); H01L33/508 (US); H10K50/86 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2015/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Organische lichtemittierende Anzeigevorrichtung[2015/03]
English:Organic light-emitting display device[2015/03]
French:Dispositif à affichage électroluminescent organique[2015/03]
Examination procedure04.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/08]
24.08.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2003086358  (SONY CORP) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]JP2003233063  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1* figure 1 *;
 [X]JP2004163461  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 *;
 [XI]WO2011027712  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 2 * [I] 3,5-12;
 [A]US2013049640  (KUO TZU-YIN [TW], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.