Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811067

EP2811067 - Method and arrangement for stabilising operation of an impingement dryer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valmet Technologies, Inc.
Keilasatama 5
02150 Espoo / FI
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Huhtala, Olli
Vähätalontie 18
21160 Merimasku / FI
02 / Mäkelä, Janne
Lehmuskuja 3 as 2
21290 Rusko / FI
03 / Norri, Petri
Virusmäentie 29 A 1
20300 Turku / FI
04 / Kaasinen, Kimmo
Puutarhakatu 8 A 14
20100 Turku / FI
05 / Thorn, Tom
Uudentorpankatu 2 C 14
21260 Raisio / FI
06 / Sjölund, Matias
Itäinen rantakatu 68 B 23
20810 Turku / FI
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date14166956.405.05.2014
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateFI2013000562907.06.2013         Original published format: FI 20135629
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811067
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811067
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:D21F5/04, D21F5/18
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung zur Stabilisierung des Betriebs eines Prallströmtrockners[2014/50]
English:Method and arrangement for stabilising operation of an impingement dryer[2014/50]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour stabiliser le fonctionnement d'un séchoir à convection[2014/50]
Examination procedure05.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
20.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2017Fee for grant paid
17.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)28.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
GB05.05.2018
IE05.05.2018
LU05.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/21]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
GB05.05.2018
IE05.05.2018
LU05.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/19]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE05.05.2018
LU05.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
LU05.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/51]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/40]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/38]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
SM27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/25]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
RS27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03000987  (METSO PAPER AUTOMATION OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,3,7-9,12,14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025]; figure 2 *;
 [X]WO03000988  (METSO PAPER INC [FI], et al) [X] 1,3,7-9 * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 2; figure 3 *;
 [XA]WO9951813  (VALMET CORP [FI], et al) [X] 9,12 * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 11; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-8
ExaminationUS5259124