Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808703

EP2808703 - Satellite receiver and method for assessing tracking loop quality of satellite receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
O2 Micro, Inc.
3118 Patrick Henry Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Gao, Ke
Level (14) Building (A) Easthope, No. 3 Gaopeng
Road
610041 Chengdu / CN
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 30 02 08
51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Lippert, Stachow & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08
51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date14167032.305.05.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateCN2013119941024.05.2013         Original published format: CN201310199410
US20141423016631.03.2014         Original published format: US201414230166
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808703
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01S19/29
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Satellitenempfänger und Verfahren zur Beurteilung der Schleifenverfolgungsqualität von Satellitenempfängern[2014/49]
English:Satellite receiver and method for assessing tracking loop quality of satellite receiver[2014/49]
French:Récepteur de satellite et procédé d'évaluation de la qualité de la boucle de poursuite de récepteur satellite[2014/49]
Examination procedure05.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
04.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/52]
10.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/52]
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2007153880  (CARTMELL ANDREW P J [US] CARTMELL ANDREW PETER JOHN [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0098] * [I] 5,7,12,14;
 [A]US2008317099  (HOU JIANHUI [CN] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - PARKINSON B W ET AL, Global Positioning System: Theory and Applications, GPS Receivers, GLOBAL POSITIONING SYSTEM: THEORY AND APPLICATIONS; [PROGRESS IN ASTRONAUTICS AND AERONAUTICS VOL. 163], WASHINGTON, DC : AIAA, US, PAGE(S) 329 - 407, (19940101), ISBN 978-1-56347-106-3, XP002294877 [X] 1,2,5,8,9,12 * figure 40 * * pages 390-392, section G.1 * * pages 393-394, section G.3 * [I] 3,4,6,7,10,11,13,14