Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806415

EP2806415 - Voice processing device and voice processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Shioda, Chisato
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
02 / Togawa, Taro
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
03 / Otani, Takeshi
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date14167181.806.05.2014
[2014/48]
Priority number, dateJP2013010927323.05.2013         Original published format: JP 2013109273
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806415
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806415
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G10L25/78, G10L21/057, G10L21/04, G09B19/06
[2016/21]
Former International [2014/48]G09B19/06, G10L21/057, G10L21/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:Gerät und Methode zur Sprachverarbeitung[2014/48]
English:Voice processing device and voice processing method[2014/48]
French:Procede et systeme de traitement vocal[2016/21]
Former [2014/48]Procédé et système de traitement vocal
Examination procedure21.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
03.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2016Fee for grant paid
15.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.05.2014
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CY02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE06.05.2017
LU06.05.2017
MT06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU06.05.2014
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE06.05.2017
LU06.05.2017
MT06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/43]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE06.05.2017
LU06.05.2017
MT06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/23]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE06.05.2017
LU06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/17]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/52]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/38]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/37]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/36]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/35]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV02.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012035922  (CARROLL MARTIN D [US]) [X] 1,8-10 * figure 1 * * page 3, paragraph 50 * * page 4, paragraph 69 * * page 7, paragraph 113 * [I] 7;
 [XI]WO0249002  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]; LAOT ANDRE [FR]; VIDAL GUY [FR]; CHALONY JOEL [FR) [X] 1,5,10,15 * page 7, line 1 - line 4 * * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 4 * * page 8, line 11 - line 24 * [I] 7;
 [A]US2006149558  (KAHN JONATHAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * page 12, paragraph 151 * * page 18, paragraph 235 * * page 25, paragraph 311 *;
 [A]US2006235688  (BICEGO JAMES E [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 64 * * page 5, paragraph 55 *
by applicantJPH10133678
 JP5160594B
 JP5149941B
 JP2575125B
    - MAKINO ET AL., "A method of vowel recognition in connected speech using the mutual relation of vowels", THE TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION, AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS, D, vol. J72-D2, no. 6, pages 837 - 845
    - SINGER ET AL., "Use of Correlation between Pitch and Spectral Parameters for HMM Phoneme Recognition", TECHNICAL REPORTS OF THE INSTITUTE OF TELEVISION ENGINEERS, (19910927), vol. 15, no. 54, pages 15 - 20