Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2777452

EP2777452 - Coffee bean packaging cartridge and method for preparing a coffee beverage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/38]Coffee beverage system, coffee brewing apparatus, coffee bean packaging cartridge and method for preparing a coffee beverage
[2017/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Douwe Egberts B.V.
Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2018/21]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
Koninklijke Douwe Egberts B.V.
Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / van Os, Ivo
c/o Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
02 / Kneppers, Job Leonardus
c/o Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
03 / Versluijs, Richard Patrick
c/o Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
04 / Moorman, Christiaan Johannes Maria
c/o Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
05 / de Graaff, Gerbrand Kristiaan
c/o Vleutensevaart 35
3532 AD Utrecht / NL
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/21]
Former [2014/38]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14167254.317.02.2011
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateWO2010NL5007717.02.2010         Original published format: PCT/NL2010/050077
NL2010200427422.02.2010         Original published format: NL 2004274
NL2010200523817.08.2010         Original published format: NL 2005238
NL2010200527826.08.2010         Original published format: NL 2005278
NL2010200528026.08.2010         Original published format: NL 2005280
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2777452
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2777452
Date:23.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/42, A47J42/50, A47J31/40
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
TitleGerman:Kaffeebohnenverpackungskartusche und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kaffeegetränks[2017/50]
English:Coffee bean packaging cartridge and method for preparing a coffee beverage[2017/50]
French:Cartouche de conditionnement de grains de café et procédé de préparation de boisson au café[2017/50]
Former [2014/38]Kaffeegetränksystem, Kaffeeaufbrühvorrichtung, Kaffeebohnenverpackungskartusche und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kaffeegetränks
Former [2014/38]Coffee beverage system, coffee brewing apparatus, coffee bean packaging cartridge and method for preparing a coffee beverage
Former [2014/38]Système de boisson au café, appareil d'infusion de café, cartouche de conditionnement de grains de café et procédé de préparation de boisson au café
Examination procedure06.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
17.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2018Fee for grant paid
11.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11154806.1  / EP2364624
Opposition(s)26.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201505   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
LU17.02.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/45]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/49]FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
NO23.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XP]US2010080886  (HOURIZADEH RICHARD [US]) [XP] 1-41 * figures 4,5,9-11 *;
 [X]EP0605750  (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN [DE]) [X] 42-48,52-57 * figures 2,3-9 *;
 [X]FR2565088  (GASPARELLA VALENTINO [IT]) [X] 1-41,49-51 * figures 3,4 *;
 [X]DE20300933U  (WIK FAR EAST LTD [HK]) [X] 1-41 * figures 2,3 *;
 [X]EP1700549  (SAECO IPR LTD [IE]) [X] 1-41 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO0027262  (MARZOCCO INTERNATIONAL L L C [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0452214  (GROUARD FRERES [FR]) [A] 1-57 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5632449  (SANDOLO RAFFAEL [US]) [A] 1-57 * figures 2,3 *;
 [AD]EP0804894  (GRINDMASTER CORP [US]) [AD] 1-57 * figures 1-8,14 *;
 [A]US2002153438  (GLUCKSMAN DOV Z [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * figures 2-6 *;
 [A]DE102007008900  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-57 * figures 1-9 *
by applicantEP0804894