Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2777452 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2777452



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 887
29.03.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.06.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
26.04.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
11.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.04.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
11.04.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 10
11.04.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 12
11.12.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.12.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.12.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 58
11.12.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 58
16.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 47
16.12.2016 Description Search / examination 25
16.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.08.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
19.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 12
19.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.02.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
18.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.10.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.10.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.10.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
12.06.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.03.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
17.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 15
17.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
20.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.08.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.08.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 6
14.08.2014 European search report Search / examination 4
16.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
04.07.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
04.07.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 14
04.07.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 15
04.07.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
06.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.05.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 14
06.05.2014 Description Search / examination 47
06.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 21
06.05.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
10.03.2011 Priority document Search / examination 130
10.03.2011 Priority document Search / examination 52
10.03.2011 Priority document Search / examination 76
10.03.2011 Priority document Search / examination 112
10.03.2011 Priority document Search / examination 46