Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2777452


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
04.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.11.2019  [2019/45]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
29.03.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
20.04.2018 (Expected) grant published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
13.04.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.12.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.11.2017 Change - German title published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
10.11.2017 Change - English title published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
10.11.2017 Change - French title published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
06.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.08.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.02.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.10.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.10.2015 First examination report
06.10.2015 Change - representative
16.05.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
16.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
19.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
17.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
15.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
10.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid