Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2777452 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201080017006 CN201180019213 CN201180019429 CN201180019436 CN201180019442 CN201180019584 CN201710311880 EP10705202 EP11154761 EP11154806

More

EP11154834 EP11154887 EP11154896 EP13179296 EP14167254



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2011102721Global Dossier 16.02.2012A3
WO2011102721 25.08.2011A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2011102720Global Dossier 08.12.2011A3
WO2011102720 25.08.2011A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2011102716Global Dossier 25.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2011102715Global Dossier 16.02.2012A3
WO2011102715 25.08.2011A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2011102714Global Dossier 16.02.2012A3
WO2011102714 25.08.2011A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2010095937Global Dossier 26.08.2010A1
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018317696Global Dossier 08.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201815970227 03.05.2018
NL2002542 17.02.2009
US201113211117 16.08.2011
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
US201414333364 16.07.2014
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015118367Global Dossier 30.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414297456 05.06.2014
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
US201213587582 16.08.2012
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2012024160Global Dossier 02.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9980599Global Dossier 29.05.2018B2
US2015157166 11.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
US201113211117 16.08.2011
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
US201414333364 16.07.2014
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9414710Global Dossier 16.08.2016B2
US2013101717 25.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
WO2011NL50108 17.02.2011
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9339141Global Dossier 17.05.2016B2
US2013115351 09.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9277838Global Dossier 08.03.2016B2
US2013095219 18.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50114 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9265377Global Dossier 23.02.2016B2
US2013095218 18.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50115 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8776671Global Dossier 15.07.2014B2
US2013115342 09.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20130018689Global Dossier 25.02.2013A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20120004413Global Dossier 12.01.2012A
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101934122BGlobal Dossier 05.04.2019B1
KR20130049173 13.05.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2013519488Global Dossier 30.05.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6321727BGlobal Dossier 09.05.2018B2
JP2016185388 27.10.2016A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5976062BGlobal Dossier 23.08.2016B2
JP2015027536 12.02.2015A
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5903052BGlobal Dossier 13.04.2016B2
JP2013519490 30.05.2013A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50114 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5877165BGlobal Dossier 02.03.2016B2
JP2013519487 30.05.2013A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
WO2011NL50108 17.02.2011
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5871398BGlobal Dossier 01.03.2016B2
JP2013519489 30.05.2013A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5837513BGlobal Dossier 24.12.2015B2
JP2013519491 30.05.2013A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50115 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5620413BGlobal Dossier 05.11.2014B2
JP2012517879 09.08.2012A
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2664260Global Dossier 20.04.2016B1
EP2664260 20.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP10705202 17.02.2010
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2436288Global Dossier 21.05.2014B1
EP2436288 08.08.2012A3
EP2436288 04.04.2012A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2436287Global Dossier 04.06.2014B1
EP2436287 08.08.2012A3
EP2436287 04.04.2012A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2412281Global Dossier 29.04.2015B1
EP2412281 01.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2409610Global Dossier 23.04.2014B1
EP2409610 25.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2403386Global Dossier 07.08.2013B1
EP2403386 11.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2364624Global Dossier 07.05.2014B1
EP2364624 01.02.2012A3
EP2364624 14.09.2011A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107259998Global Dossier 20.10.2017A
Priority number Date
CN201180019436 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102984976BGlobal Dossier 22.02.2017B
CN102984976 20.03.2013A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50115 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102970907BGlobal Dossier 31.05.2017B
CN102970907 13.03.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102970906BGlobal Dossier 15.03.2017B
CN102970906 13.03.2013A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102946772BGlobal Dossier 10.08.2016B
CN102946772 27.02.2013A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
WO2011NL50108 17.02.2011
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102946771BGlobal Dossier 06.07.2016B
CN102946771 27.02.2013A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50114 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102395304BGlobal Dossier 29.06.2016B
CN102395304 28.03.2012A
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2950519Global Dossier 16.07.2019C
CA2950519 26.08.2010A1
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
CA2752745 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2789858Global Dossier 10.07.2018C
CA2789858 25.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50114 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2789657Global Dossier 05.03.2019C
CA2789657 25.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2752745Global Dossier 17.01.2017C
CA2752745 26.08.2010A1
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2777452Global Dossier 23.05.2018B1
EP2777452 17.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
EP11154806 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2010216509B 13.10.2016B2
AU2010216509 06.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011216589B 06.04.2017B9
AU2011216589B 23.02.2017B2
AU2011216589 30.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
WO2011NL50108 17.02.2011
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011216590B 03.11.2016B2
AU2011216590 30.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011216591B 16.02.2017B2
AU2011216591 30.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011216595B 02.02.2017B2
AU2011216595 30.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50114 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011216596B 02.02.2017B2
AU2011216596 30.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50115 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2017200772B 29.11.2018B2
AU2017200772 23.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
AU2011216590 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
AU2017200772 03.02.2017
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BE1019670 04.09.2012A3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BE1019875 05.02.2013A5
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BE1019876 05.02.2013A5
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BE1019877 05.02.2013A5
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BE1019953 05.03.2013A5
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI1008720 08.03.2016A2
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012020602 13.03.2018A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50114 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012020605 24.09.2019A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012020623 20.03.2018A2
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012020625 26.04.2016A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50115 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112012020626 20.03.2018A2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
WO2011NL50108 17.02.2011
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2789450 25.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50115 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2789851 25.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2789882 25.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
WO2011NL50108 17.02.2011
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202011109912U 29.05.2012U1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202011109913U 29.05.2012U1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202011109919U 14.06.2012U1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202011109933U 18.06.2012U1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202011109935U 18.06.2012U1
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2364624T 11.08.2014T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2403386T 11.11.2013T3
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2409610T 28.07.2014T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2436287T 11.08.2014T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2436288T 25.08.2014T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2434262T 16.12.2013T3
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2484265T 11.08.2014T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2486302T 18.08.2014T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2489473T 02.09.2014T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2493922T 12.09.2014T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2544042T 27.08.2015T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2583846T 22.09.2016T3
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2675643T 11.07.2018T3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FR2956303 05.10.2012B3
FR2956303 19.08.2011A3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FR2956304 05.10.2012B3
FR2956304 19.08.2011A3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FR2956305 05.10.2012B3
FR2956305 19.08.2011A3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FR2956306 05.10.2012B3
FR2956306 19.08.2011A3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
FR2956307 05.10.2012B3
FR2956307 19.08.2011A3
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX340297 05.07.2016B
MX2011008604 06.12.2011A
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX343947 30.11.2016B
MX2012009472 30.11.2012A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2012009476 30.11.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NL2005280C 18.08.2011C2
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL00500 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NL2006222C 07.08.2012C2
NL2006222 18.08.2011A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2006222 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NL2006232C 04.09.2012C2
NL2006232 18.08.2011A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2006232 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NL2006237C 07.08.2012C2
NL2006237 18.08.2011A
Priority number Date
NL2006237 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NL2006239C 09.08.2012C2
NL2006239 18.08.2011A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2006239 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NL2009293C 08.08.2013C2
NL2009293 13.11.2012A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2009293 08.08.2012
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2006232 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ594670 30.04.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ601806 31.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
WO2010NZ50077 17.02.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
NZ60180611 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ601807 28.02.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2544162 10.03.2015C2
RU2012139436 27.03.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2011NL50109 17.02.2011
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2556513 10.07.2015C2
RU2012139435 27.03.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50110 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2557749 27.07.2015C2
RU2012139428 27.03.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
WO2011NL50108 17.02.2011
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2561027 20.08.2015C2
RU2012139434 27.03.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50115 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2576014 27.02.2016C2
RU2011138190 20.04.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2002542 17.02.2009
NL2002764 17.04.2009
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
NL2002719 06.04.2009
NL2003184 10.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2576608 10.03.2016C2
RU2012139427 10.04.2014A
Priority number Date
NL2005278 26.08.2010
NL2005280 26.08.2010
NL2005238 17.08.2010
WO2010NL50077 17.02.2010
WO2011NL50114 17.02.2011
NL2004274 22.02.2010
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2364624