Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801554

EP2801554 - Method for reducing the calcium load in water guided through conduits and device for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.08.2017  [2017/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schwarting, Isolde
Bloher Landstrasse 39 s
26160 Bad Zwischenahn / DE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Jabbusch, Matthias
Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85
26131 Oldenburg / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date14167296.407.05.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateDE2013100799508.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013007995
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801554
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:C02F9/00, C02F5/08
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Reduzieren der Kalkbelastung in durch Leitungen geführtem Wasser und Vorrichtung zum Durchführen des Verfahrens[2014/46]
English:Method for reducing the calcium load in water guided through conduits and device for carrying out the method[2014/46]
French:Procédé de réduction de la teneur en calcaire dans l'eau acheminée dans des conduites et procédé d'exécution du procédé[2014/46]
Examination procedure11.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
09.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.07.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
05.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19960700  (SCHWARTING GEORG C [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 48; figure 1; claims 1,7 *;
 [X]US2009159461  (MCCUTCHEN WILMOT H [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0213] - [0221]; figures 1,6,7 *;
 [X]US2002131923  (ACTON ELIZABETH [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] - [0057] , [0075]; figure 1 *