Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801883

EP2801883 - Thermostat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE Behr Kornwestheim GmbH
Enzstrasse 25-33
70806 Kornwestheim / DE
[2015/49]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Behr Thermot-tronik GmbH
Enzstrasse 25-35
70806 Kornwestheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Willers, Eike
Kräherstrasse 2
70469 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Klein, Hans-Peter
Seestrasse 37
71397 Leutenbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]01 / Willers, Eike, Dr.
Kräherstrasse 2
70469 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Klein, Hans-Peter, Dr.
Seestrasse 37
71397 Leutenbach / DE
Representative(s)Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Wartbergstrasse 14
70191 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Presselstrasse 10
70191 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14167302.007.05.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateDE20131020841607.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013208416
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2801883
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2801883
Date:05.08.2015
Language:DE
[2015/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/12
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Thermostat[2014/46]
English:Thermostat[2014/46]
French:Thermostat[2014/46]
Examination procedure05.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/11]
07.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1881310  (VERNET [FR]) [X] 1,5-7,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,8-11;
 [XY]DE1523392  (SAMSON APPBAU AG) [X] 1,4,7,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8-11;
 [Y]EP0375335  (CARADON MIRA LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE102009024263  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE102004043828  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *