Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801882

EP2801882 - Thermostat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE Behr Kornwestheim GmbH
Enzstrasse 25-33
70806 Kornwestheim / DE
[2015/49]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Behr Thermot-tronik GmbH
Enzstrasse 25-35
70806 Kornwestheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klein, Dr. Hans-Peter
Seestraße 37
71397 Leutenbach / DE
02 / Willers, Dr. Eike
Kräherstr. 2
70469 Stuttgart / DE
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Wartbergstrasse 14
70191 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Presselstrasse 10
70191 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14167333.507.05.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateDE20131020841207.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013208412
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2801882
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2801882
Date:05.08.2015
Language:DE
[2015/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/02, G05D23/30
[2019/44]
Former International [2015/32]G05D23/02, G05D23/19
Former International [2014/46]G05D23/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Thermostat[2014/46]
English:Thermostat[2014/46]
French:Thermostat[2014/46]
Examination procedure05.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/11]
23.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2114292  (DRAYTON CONTROLS) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8,10-12;
 [XY]WO2011158235  (FISHMAN THERMO TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 5 - page 8 * [Y] 2-8,10-12;
 [XY]US4685651  (NOUVELLE ROBERT [FR], et al) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8,10-12;
 [Y]DE102009024263  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [[0014]] , [[0015]] , [[0030]] *
by applicantDE10110185