Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802038

EP2802038 - Systems and methods for satellite communication with mobile platforms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rosen, Harold A.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
02 / Sichi, Stephen Floyd
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
03 / Trujillo, Mike T.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
04 / Kuo, Lisa
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
05 / Rutheiser, Joshua Maxwell
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date14167426.707.05.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateUS20131388841507.05.2013         Original published format: US201313888415
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2802038
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2802038
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/28, H01Q3/00, H01Q19/17, H01Q21/08, H01Q25/00, H04B7/185
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Systeme und Verfahren für Satellitenkommunikation mit mobilen Plattformen[2014/46]
English:Systems and methods for satellite communication with mobile platforms[2014/46]
French:Systèmes et procédés de communication par satellite avec des plates-formes mobiles[2014/46]
Examination procedure03.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
25.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2303764  (INT MOBILE SATELLITE ORG [GB]) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 19-24 *;
 [XI]US4315262  (ACAMPORA ANTHONY ET AL) [X] 1,2,7 * column 10; figure 6 * [I] 4-6;
 [XI]US4439773  (CHU TA-SHING [US]) [X] 1,7 * column 2 - column 4; figures 1-2 * [I] 2,4-6;
 [XAI]US2004147257  (PHILLIPS KEVIN PAUL [GB] ET AL) [X] 8,9,14 * page 2; figure 1 * [A] 3 [I] 10-13,15;
 [X]US4819227  (ROSEN HAROLD A [US]) [X] 8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005261028  (CHITRAPU PRABHAKAR R [US]) [A] 3,13 * paragraph [0004] *